Financial history FOSTS FRIENDS OF ST TERESA'S

Charity number: 1112239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £11.80k £11.31k £13.06k £6.69k £2.19k
Total expenditure £11.65k £12.45k £12.77k £9.52k £1.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A