LONDON VISITATION ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1117833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 26 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 July 2019 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 08 July 2019 434 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required