Financial history LONDON VISITATION ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1117833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £2.87k £2.84k £3.02k £3.56k £9.97k
Total expenditure £1.56k £1.74k £2.17k £3.24k £9.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A