Governance NOT POINTLESS
Charity number: 1112848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 27 January 2006: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 October 2009: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 June 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.