AFRICA 2000

Charity number: 1116590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.52k £6.55k £5.12k £9.50k £8.67k
Total expenditure £2.61k £6.27k £4.85k £9.74k £8.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A