Financial history PETER ALLISS MASTERS

Charity number: 1113745
Charity reporting is up to date (174 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £87.98k £110.24k £66.62k £57.29k £114.21k
Total expenditure £89.62k £106.17k £59.73k £78.66k £93.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A