FRIENDS OF AMASANGO

Charity number: 1116268
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £86.98k £46.31k £37.08k £51.56k £59.34k
Total expenditure £46.71k £63.98k £48.00k £42.50k £46.46k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A