Dogfen lywodraethu APASEN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/03/2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND DEPRIVATION FOR PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND/OR WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEEDS. 2. TO PROVIDE ADVICE, SUPPORT, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING AND TRAINING TO THOSE IN NEED. 3. TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN CENTRES FOR HEALTH, EDUCATION AND RECREATION. 4. TO PROVIDE CARE AND SUPPORT TO THOSE IN CHARITABLE NEED.
Maes buddion
TOWER HAMLETS, LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.