Financial history WORKERS' EDUCATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1112775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £27.39m £27.43m £28.84m £30.31m £28.49m
Total expenditure £27.54m £27.26m £27.88m £25.46m £27.66m
Income from government contracts £563.00k £540.00k £5.23m £3.80m £3.62m
Income from government grants £19.70m £21.95m £20.48m £24.49m £20.26m
Income - Donations and legacies £46.00k £44.00k £97.32k £78.00k £48.00k
Income - Other trading activities £29.00k £0 £1.13k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £26.42m £26.46m £27.78m £29.66m £27.56m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £827.00k £904.00k £954.44k £552.00k £13.00k
Income - Other £72.00k £18.00k £13.89k £17.00k £870.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £2.00k £500 £2.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £26.69m £26.37m £27.02m £24.92m £27.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £215.00k £262.00k £214.52k £231.00k £278.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.40m £3.36m £3.71m £1.93m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £850.00k £884.00k £864.00k £538.00k £650.00k