Accounts and annual returns CHILDREN OF DEAF PARENTS UK

Charity number: 1114877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 November 2021 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 November 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2020 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 15 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required