Financial history CHILDREN OF DEAF PARENTS UK

Charity number: 1114877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.57k £76 £2.08k £9.56k £787
Total expenditure £3.23k £164 £2.09k £3.96k £2.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A