SOUTHAMPTON ADVICE & REPRESENTATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1112999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £260.75k £247.88k £261.65k £273.07k £256.96k
Total expenditure £275.78k £268.28k £241.48k £234.68k £236.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £5.68k £100.00k
Income from government grants £200.61k £189.60k £182.60k £145.92k N/A