THE APAX FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1112845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.79m £1.46m £1.22m £1.62m £4.08m
Total expenditure £1.20m £1.63m £1.07m £3.18m £5.97m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £793.57k £8.44k £656.38k £35.35k £41.52k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £594.69k £0 £0 £3.43m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £507.41k £662.98k £558.84k £680.25k £611.52k
Income - Other £0 £0 £610.90k £908.50k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.18m £980.56k £1.05m £1.88m £5.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.00k £40.07k £23.17k £18.45k £19.79k
Expenditure - Governance £15.69k £19.94k £17.30k £36.75k £55.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.16m £960.62k £1.03m £1.85m £5.90m
Expenditure - Investment management £41.00k £40.07k £23.17k £18.45k £19.79k
Expenditure - Other -£21.11k £606.34k £0 £1.28m £0