Financial history WESTON PARK TRUST

Charity number: 1112685
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £80.14k £98.09k £93.87k £123.74k £99.59k
Total expenditure £80.14k £89.93k £93.87k £116.67k £99.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.56k £70.44k £70.62k £105.51k £91.82k