FIVE TALENTS UK LTD

Charity number: 1113969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sietske van der Ploeg Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
Agnes Gitau Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
NEIL SANDY Chair 20 April 2012
THE HUGH PILKINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Thomas Jones Trustee 11 February 2020 None on record
TREVOR SMITH Trustee 16 September 2013 None on record
Michelle Ruddle Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
Gill Miller Trustee 12 December 2013
FIELD STUDIES COUNCIL Received: On time
Beverley Jullien Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
Gordon Seabright Trustee 01 October 2016 None on record
GRANT MASOM Trustee None on record
ANDREW MACLAY Trustee None on record