USPAR TRUST

Charity number: 1115076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.93k £8.42k £7.40k £6.70k £4.90k
Total expenditure £10.15k £7.40k £9.61k £6.56k £6.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A