WYTHENSHAWE COMMUNITY INITIATIVE LIMITED

Charity number: 1112990
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 April 2018 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 April 2018 75 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 January 2017 On time Download