WARNING ZONE LIMITED

Charity number: 1113659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £533.38k £360.18k £364.09k £501.38k £352.11k
Total expenditure £459.90k £354.08k £357.35k £346.45k £376.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £142.21k £40.00k £50.00k £70.50k £117.24k
Income - Donations and legacies £385.09k N/A N/A £208.88k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £42.07k N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £106.14k N/A N/A £123.07k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £89 N/A N/A £22.92k N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A £146.50k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £444.00k N/A N/A £338.97k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.91k N/A N/A £7.49k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.73k N/A N/A £4.96k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A £0 N/A