INTERNATIONAL ECO FUND

Charity number: 1115374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £0 £4.28k £3.84k £4.03k £2.12m
Total expenditure £55.17k £189.55k £410.59k £164.48k £73.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.09m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.09m
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £29.71k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £63.78k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £63.78k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0