HOUNSLOW MUSLIM WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 December 2020 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2021 352 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 December 2020 674 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 September 2017 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required