Financial history THE ARDEN DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1113086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £40.33k £35.68k £35.48k £32.48k £15.38k
Total expenditure £40.68k £32.34k £34.26k £33.71k £10.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A