DURHAM LOCOMOTIVE PRESERVATIONS GROUP (DLPG)

Charity number: 1114642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 13 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required