DURHAM LOCOMOTIVE PRESERVATIONS GROUP (DLPG)

Charity number: 1114642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.84k £12.86k £21.21k £22.63k £8.97k
Total expenditure £16.32k £12.42k £14.50k £17.27k £8.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A