AL MUNIR WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1116533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 November 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 November 2020 385 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 November 2020 750 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 November 2020 1115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required