THE FRIENDS OF SAINT MARY MAGDALENE'S CHURCH SUNDERLAND

Charity number: 1113342
Charity reporting is overdue by 1489 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 393 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 393 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 759 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 759 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1124 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1124 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1489 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1489 days