AFRICAN FUTURE DEVELOPMENT

Charity number: 1115026
Charity reporting is overdue by 301 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 301 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 301 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time Download