Accounts and annual returns POLISH PARENTS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1113408
Charity reporting is overdue by 364 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 364 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 364 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 November 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 19 November 2022 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2022 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2022 | 323 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2018 | 26 June 2019 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2018 | 26 June 2019 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window