Accounts and annual returns PRIORY PARK AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1114946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2021 13 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2021 20 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 May 2020 04 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 04 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 May 2019 15 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 29 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window