Financial history FURNESS CARERS

Charity number: 1114029
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £285.67k £384.11k £305.43k £261.43k £319.19k
Total expenditure £286.25k £318.04k £335.83k £271.01k £236.19k
Income from government contracts £188.55k £55.00k £160.94k £220.57k £221.66k
Income from government grants £75.02k £85.10k £87.84k £11.30k £11.00k