AL HUDA ACADEMY & ISLAMIC TRUST

Charity number: 1114305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 February 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 March 2018 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 April 2018 64 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 December 2016 On time Download