Financial history CLIFTON COLLEGE ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 1113320
Charity reporting is up to date (148 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £82.22k £96.55k £110.05k £102 £175.65k
Total expenditure £27.33k £30.86k £33.21k £102 £164.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A