Financial history LOUTH AND DISTRICT ARTHRITIS GROUP

Charity number: 1114988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £1.66k £1.66k £2.19k £1.66k £0
Total expenditure £2.91k £2.91k £2.39k £2.21k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A