Financial history SHANTI NAGAR ST ANDREW'S TRUST

Charity number: 1115662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.05k £7.86k £3.12k £4.22k £3.30k
Total expenditure £3.72k £3.73k £3.74k £3.74k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A