HOME-START BANBURY & CHIPPING NORTON

Charity number: 1114860
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHLOE WOODHEAD Chair 27 November 2017
EDGAR PALAMOUNTAIN MEMORIAL TRUST Received: On time
Valerie Knight Trustee 11 July 2019 None on record
Amanjit Dhillon Trustee 25 February 2021 None on record
DOUGLAS KEIR Trustee
HOME-START OXFORD Received: On time
JOSEPHINE MARY GRAVES Trustee
FRIENDS OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN PARISH CHURCH, CHIPPING NORTON Received: On time
ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHIPPING NORTON, PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL Received: On time
PETE WELPLY Trustee 10 September 2013 None on record
ANNE WATERS Trustee 02 October 2012 None on record