THE LIVERPOOL ACADEMY OF ARTS

Charity number: 1114232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 11 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 05 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required