THE TRUSTEES OF THE SWINTON HIGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1114368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 March 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 March 2021 418 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 July 2019 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required