THE READING HINDU CENTRE

Charity number: 1115850
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2021 368 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 November 2021 368 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 October 2017 On time Download