THE READING HINDU CENTRE

Charity number: 1115850
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ASHOK KHARE Chair 05 September 2006 None on record
SRIKRISHNAN SRIRAM Trustee 05 August 2006 None on record
Karanvir Mehra Trustee 03 July 2019
SOUTH EAST BERKSHIRE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
VIJAY MISTRY Trustee 05 August 2006 None on record
SUNIL MEHAN Trustee 18 July 2013 None on record
Shashi Kumar Mawkin Trustee 05 July 2017 None on record
GOVIND BHATTI Trustee 05 August 2006
HINDU SOCIETY(READING) Received: On time
LAXMAN CHOUHAN Trustee 05 August 2006
VISION BHARAT UK Received: On time
BHUPENDRA SODHA Trustee 05 August 2006 None on record
Khushboo Panwar Trustee 01 July 2016 None on record
BHUPENDRA SANKHLA Trustee 05 August 2006 None on record