DORSET SEARCH & RESCUE (DORSAR)

Charity number: 1121658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £33.24k £23.40k £24.11k £57.04k £66.74k
Total expenditure £26.35k £19.05k £33.24k £39.27k £71.89k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.57k £11.92k £35.67k