Financial history WEST HAM UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1114458
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £3.44m £4.52m £3.12m £3.34m £3.61m
Total expenditure £3.21m £4.57m £3.22m £3.16m £3.34m
Income from government contracts £226.14k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.57k £397.46k £412.86k £269.17k £303.23k
Income - Other trading activities £850.92k £1.85m £475.23k £380.26k £626.39k
Income - Charitable activities £2.58m £2.28m £2.23m £2.69m £2.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.62m £2.99m £2.88m £2.88m £3.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.20k £12.50k £7.20k £9.70k £10.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £591.69k £1.58m £338.20k £288.26k £239.50k