Dogfen lywodraethu BOURNEMOUTH BLIND SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/03/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JUN 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 OCT 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ASSIST AND BENEFIT, BUT NOT WITH DIRECT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, PEOPLE WITH A VISUAL IMPAIRMENT AND/OR HEARING IMPAIRMENT LIVING WITHIN THE BOURNEMOUTH/CHRISTCHURCH/POOLE AREA. (B) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF SIGHT AND/OR HEARING LOSS.
Maes buddion
BOURNEMOUTH, CHRISTCHURCH, POOLE AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.