Financial history OMID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1115318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £526.38k £744.49k £875.05k £573.37k £276.65k
Total expenditure £763.49k £701.06k £573.37k £381.17k £388.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £526.38k £738.86k £875.05k £568.67k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £1.38k N/A
Income - Other £0 £5.63k £0 £3.32k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £656.04k £596.95k £471.22k £333.96k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £99.65k £104.11k £96.16k £41.21k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £7.80k £6.60k £0 £6.00k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £546.61k £545.50k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £7.80k £0 £6.00k £6.00k N/A