Financial history THE CHURCH OF GODS GRACE

Charity number: 1120732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.99k £28.69k £25.00k £18.06k £15.42k
Total expenditure £20.58k £27.43k £22.00k £20.51k £14.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A