Financial history VALE AND FOSSEWAY RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1115596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.26k £3.95k £3.86k £10.81k £2.09k
Total expenditure £4.09k £3.62k £3.48k £8.18k £7.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A