Trustees VALE AND FOSSEWAY RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1115596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicolette Shore Chair 24 June 2021
None on record
Stephen Charles Cumberland Trustee 27 January 2022
None on record
Julie Kirk Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Dr Anne MJR Cooreman Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Jason Feehily Trustee 10 March 2020
None on record
Louise McDonald Trustee 17 October 2019
None on record
Kevin John Isaacs Trustee 30 May 2019
None on record
Susan Athow-Frost Trustee 03 July 2018
None on record
HENRY PERCIVAL BOLTON CLARK Trustee
None on record