Financial history CITY OF PEACE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1114921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £54.98k £37.26k £37.01k £47.86k £35.96k
Total expenditure £47.43k £41.39k £28.87k £39.44k £26.86k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A