BOLTON COMMUNITY LEISURE

Charity number: 1117186

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
INAYAT OMARAJI Trustee None on record
John Kirk Shepley Trustee 22 July 2013
RIVINGTON HERITAGE TRUST Received: On time
Dr Margaret Anne Talbot Trustee 09 September 2016 None on record
JOHN BYRNE Trustee 05 September 2014
BOLTON MIDDLEBROOK LEISURE TRUST Received: On time
BOB ATKINSON Trustee
ST JAMES C OF E SCHOOL APPEALS ASSOCIATION Received: On time
DAVID SINGLETON Chair 06 September 2012
BOLTON LADS AND GIRLS CLUB LIMITED Received: On time
BOLTON WANDERERS COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
Sara Louise Sharrock Trustee 17 February 2017 None on record