Accounts and annual returns TRUST FOR AROCHUKWU UK

Charity number: 1115479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required