AR RAHMAH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1115618
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 06 April 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 06 April 2021 37 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 11 April 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 11 April 2019 42 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 26 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 09 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 09 June 2016 On time Download