Financial history MUSHTAQ WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1115506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £42.39k £44.13k £63.10k £51.48k £116.23k
Total expenditure £22.95k £33.91k £52.35k £60.97k £6.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A